HOUSE OF HOPE (UK)

Charity number: 1124437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 April 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 31 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 19 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required