HOUSE OF HOPE (UK)

Charity number: 1124437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £9.55k £5.60k £2.28k £1.85k £0
Total expenditure £8.30k £5.40k £1.17k £200 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A