SHERNHALL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1123684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £288.94k £301.67k £316.59k £347.32k £300.23k
Total expenditure £303.26k £290.31k £305.56k £327.82k £312.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £237.34k £260.89k £299.15k N/A
Income from government grants £257.66k £0 N/A N/A £242.88k