FIRTASH FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year Firtash Foundation remained committed to supporting its charitable objectives, one of which is advancement of Ukrainian arts, culture, heritage or science. Building on the success of previous Days of Ukraine in the UK festivals, Firtash Foundation continued to organise a series of exhibitions and competitions to support and showcase the works of young talents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Ukraine
Governance
- 02 June 2008: Standard registration
- 25 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DF FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.65k | £1.48m | £89 | £230.06k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.55k | £1.48m | £181.32k | £67.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.48m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £15 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.48m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £9.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/07/2013
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING OR RESTRICTING THE GENERALITY THEREOF):- 1) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND FUNDING OF A CHAIR IN UKRANIAN STUDIES AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR UNIVERSITIES AND THE FUNDING OF RESEARCH AND TEACHING OF UKRANIAN STUDIES IN ORDER TO BROADEN UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORY, LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND PEOPLE OF THE REPUBLIC OF UKRANE, 2) THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIP, BURSARIES PRIZES, GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES TO STUDENT OR PROSPECTIVE STUDENTS OF UKRANIAN STUDIES AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR COLLEGE OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM; B) THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE COMPANY ("THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE REPUBLIC OF UKRAINE.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window