THE THOMAS MOFFITT CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1123591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 October 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 10 October 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 10 October 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 10 October 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2016 22 November 2016 On time Download