ST PETERS MAR THOMA CHURCH EAST AREA, LONDON - UK

Charity number: 1123807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £129.66k £86.73k £81.03k £73.51k £103.33k
Total expenditure £76.04k £80.61k £79.38k £57.65k £76.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A