ST PETERS MAR THOMA CHURCH EAST AREA, LONDON - UK

Charity number: 1123807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jobi Koruthu Vicar Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Mathew Alumkal Chacko TTE-AR Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Alice Alex Lukose TTE -SuS Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
REJI THANKACHAN TTE-Acc Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Sam P George TTASSEMBLY Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Caroline Benoy Youth rep Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Kurian John Secretary Trustee 01 April 2021
THE COUNCIL OF THE MAR THOMA PARISHES IN EUROPE (COMPE) Received: On time
JIMMY JACOB EM Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Thomas Alexander Accountant Trustee 08 August 2021 None on record
Alex Lukose TTE - Fin Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Shibu Abraham TTE -AR Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Santhosh George TTE -AR Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Omana Koshy V P Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
Shiju Thomas A R Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
Siby George A R Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record