Accounts and annual returns KARAI WELFARE SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 1126413
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 April 2023 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window