HARLESDEN UMMAH

Charity number: 1125188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £26.99k £37.70k £23.92k £23.64k £48.68k
Total expenditure £27.35k £31.43k £31.57k £28.94k £27.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k