Melanoma Focus

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Melanoma Focus is a national charity dedicated to providing a comprehensive and authoritative source of information about this most deadly form of skin cancer. The charity funds education and independent research projects, acts as an advocate for patients and carers, informs the general public and promotes the professional interests of clinicians, scientists & nurses working in the melanoma field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£546,265
Donations and legacies | £293.83k | |
Charitable activities | £59.02k | |
Other trading activities | £190.33k | |
Investments | £3.10k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£498,850
Raising funds | £48.19k | |
Charitable activities | £450.66k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £48.19k | |
Charitable expenditure | £450.66k | |
Retained for future use | £47.42k |
People

4 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- MELANOMA FOCUS (Previous name)
- MELANOMA RESEARCH FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mark Harries | Chair | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hugh William Munro | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Oliver Ulmann | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayley Anne Dempsey | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Horrobin | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE DENISE STEVENS | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Anne Harwood | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Samra Turajlic | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Anne Hodgetts | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Cheese | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HOWARD SKYRME PEACH | Trustee | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.42k | £263.00k | £386.01k | £352.22k | £546.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.43k | £245.00k | £352.38k | £355.48k | £498.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £293.83k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £190.33k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £59.02k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.10k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £450.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.27k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £422.93k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £92.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JUNE 2008. as amended on 25 Aug 2020 as amended on 05 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are (a) to promote research into the causes and the treatment of melanoma for the public benefit; and (b) to raise awareness and advance education in relation to melanoma and its prevention, both to the general public and within the medical and scientific community, by: • producing, collecting, maintaining and disseminating information and materials about the disease, its treatment, the minimisation of risk in relation to it, and its prevention; and • supporting the development of clinical guidelines and consensus positions about the treatment of all forms of melanoma, and improving the efficiency, skill and knowledge of health professionals working in the melanoma field.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE ITALY, FRANCE, GERMANY, BELGIUM, NETHERLANDS, SPAIN, FINLAND, SWEDEN, NORWAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SALISBURY HOUSE
STATION ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 2LA
- Phone:
- 01223 324 359
- Email:
- info@melanomafocus.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window