BRIDGES HULL LTD

Charity number: 1123951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £63.84k £82.17k £99.24k £97.33k £88.92k
Total expenditure £62.31k £78.20k £96.76k £97.84k £89.28k
Income from government contracts £52.50k £74.79k £86.65k £85.10k £83.09k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A