THE ARM OF GOD INTERNATIONAL CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1124348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £23.01k £11.62k £23.09k £21.07k £17.90k
Total expenditure £20.73k £11.40k £23.43k £20.48k £18.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A