WEALDSTONE YOUTH FC (RUISLIP)

Charity number: 1124918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £77.16k £59.03k £60.61k £66.83k £70.54k
Total expenditure £72.71k £52.00k £64.22k £64.74k £73.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A