DOVEDALE ARTS

Charity number: 1124004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £24.31k £3.13k £37.03k £386 £341
Total expenditure £27.77k £142 £38.12k £642 £4.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A