TUNZA'S PRIDE

Charity number: 1126994
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 October 2020 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 October 2020 250 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 May 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 May 2017 25 days late Download