ABERGELE COMMUNITY ACTION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abergele Community Action aims to extend activities and opportunities for local people especially young people through a range of activities including foodbank and money advice as well as a youth inclusion project known as Abergele Youth Shed with opportunities for education and training as well as work experience and volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £44,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 24 July 2008: Standard registration
- ABERGELE YOUTH ACTION LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Marie Woolley | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Susan Heap-Williams | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Tracey Anne Brennan | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Alan Hunter | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Martin McCoubrey | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PAUL TAVERNOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.98k | £237.45k | £227.44k | £227.44k | £397.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.48k | £200.67k | £205.03k | £205.03k | £360.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £34.09k | £13.27k | £44.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/06/2015
Charitable objects
3. THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS SHALL INCLUDE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP PEOPLE IN ABERGELE AND SURROUNDING AREA, WITH A SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 AND 25, THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN IHE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR WELLBEING AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR WELLBEING, SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
ABERGELE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Platform 2
Abergele and Pensarn Station
Station Approach
Abergele Pensarn
Conwy
LL22 7PQ
- Phone:
- 07709552336
- Email:
- info@abergeleaction.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window