THE ACADEMY FOR THEATRE ARTS LTD

Charity number: 1124469
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 October 2020 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 October 2020 105 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 08 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 26 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 26 May 2016 On time Download