THE ACADEMY FOR THEATRE ARTS LTD

Charity number: 1124469
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £187.09k £176.54k £122.06k £118.49k £186.42k
Total expenditure £191.12k £179.14k £162.49k £143.40k £186.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A