THE FOOTLIGHTS TRUST CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1124022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 12 February 2021 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 12 February 2021 715 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 29 March 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required