Financial history AMBER TRAINING, ADVISORY & SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1124304
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £81.94k £84.21k £81.48k £81.61k £80.55k
Total expenditure £62.47k £83.90k £82.29k £76.93k £79.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £24.60k £31.01k