PEOPLES NEEDS UK

Charity number: 1126860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download