BOGOLYUBOV FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124193
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 29/02/2020
Total gross income £1.71m £412 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.25m £648.56k £550.65k £53.34k £252.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.71m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £37 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.16m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £30.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.16m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £58.11k N/A N/A N/A N/A