THE ASDA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 September 2016 On time Download