Financial history YOUTH BUSINESS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1123946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.50m £3.50m £5.67m £4.21m £6.61m
Total expenditure £4.41m £4.45m £4.80m £3.55m £6.20m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £80.51k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.30m £3.43m £5.64m £451.06k £514.39k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £65.61k £26.53k £3.73m £6.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £1.60k £27.11k £5.30k
Income - Other £194.19k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.29m £4.18m £4.54m £3.27m £6.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £125.15k £269.92k £257.90k £277.60k £173.19k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £27.87k £0 £17.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £794.54k £0 £3.33m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0