Trustees YOUTH BUSINESS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1123946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR George Malcolm Williamson Chair
None on record
Caroline Adenike Adeyemi Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Boris Tkachenko Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Romeo Effs Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Andrew Smart Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Marie Staunton CBE Trustee 06 December 2018
None on record
Anita Tiessen Trustee 07 December 2017
THE FORUM FOR THE FUTURE
Received: On time
Timothy Copnell Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
Jeannie Helen Arthur Trustee 03 December 2015
None on record
Crispin William Rapinet Trustee 17 July 2014
ST LUKE'S TRUSTEE LIMITED
Received: On time
Fadi Sarkis Trustee 14 October 2013
None on record