Accounts and annual returns MERCIFUL CENTRE
Charity number: 1125223
Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 147 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 21 April 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 314 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
04 April 2020
(These accounts |
15 December 2021 | 314 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2019 | 31 March 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2019 | 31 March 2020 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window