ST GREGORY'S PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the necessary facilities for the daily care, recreation and education of children; and to advance the education and training of the persons involved in the provision of such care, education and recreational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 21 May 2008: Standard registration
- LITTLE GREG'S PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miss Freda Ellis | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ashford | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Quirke | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Wilkes | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bromley | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KIM LEES | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.38k | £178.23k | £206.85k | £196.71k | £272.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.91k | £227.02k | £215.24k | £231.64k | £263.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, IN EACH CASE ONLY INSOFAR AS SUCH OBJECTS ARE NOT CONTRARY TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND CREED OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE,WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Gregs Pre School
Avenue Road
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Warwickshire
CV37 6UZ
- Phone:
- 01789290198
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window