INTERNATIONAL HIV FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In this financial year, the International HIV Fund continue into operation with a Secretariat based in London. The year saw the contracting of operational activities and a seasonal fundraising campaign. Furthermore the organisation built its network of organisations working in the area of HIV in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- Chad
- China
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- India
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Mauritius
- Niger
- Pakistan
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 04 July 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.24k | £60.55k | £4.37k | £50.69k | £36.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65 | £1.70k | £60.25k | £47.41k | £52.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 09 March 2014 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 08 March 2014 | 36 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED AS A PRACTICAL MANIFESTATION AND APPLICATION OF HUMANITARIAN VALUES, INSPIRED BY THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN ORDER TO RELIEVE, SUPPORT, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV OR AIDS, OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF CONTRACTING HIV AND AIDS RELATED ILLNESSES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RAISING AWARENESS OF AND/OR WORKING TOWARDS REDUCING THE SOCIO-ECONOMIC IMPACT OF HIV AND AIDS RELATED DISEASES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window