THE RAY WILLIAMS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity commenced trading in2009, donating funds to to small charities within the West Midlands on projects within its' remit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Elizabeth craig | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR RAY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCES PHILOMENA MCCARTHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.63k | £15.71k | £19.42k | £24.51k | £24.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.10k | £24.64k | £21.24k | £23.50k | £24.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 31 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW. 2 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME BUT MAY NOT USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY (WHICH SHALL BE INVESTED AS A PERMANENT ENDOWMENT) IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RAY WILLIAMS FOUNDATION
64 Sytch Lane
Wombourne
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV5 0JP
- Phone:
- 07582034800
- Email:
- rayraxton@gmail.com
- Website:
-
pobox.5472
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window