Financial history DYFODOL POWYS FUTURES

Charity number: 1126794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £55.48k £55.87k £18.41k £19.14k £20.74k
Total expenditure £66.41k £72.16k £28.78k £23.52k £12.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £1.45k N/A N/A