Accounts and annual returns GREEN TARA TRUST

Charity number: 1125356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 30 December 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 29 December 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required