Financial history GREEN TARA TRUST

Charity number: 1125356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £14.83k £7.85k £3.94k £2.98k £33.48k
Total expenditure £55.32k £48.94k £15.83k £3.41k £3.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A