ANIMAL WELFARE OF LUXOR

Charity number: 1124154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £28.89k £23.36k £24.92k £22.69k £26.55k
Total expenditure £22.76k £26.73k £18.43k £17.58k £25.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A