Accounts and annual returns LANGBUURI LIMITED

Charity number: 1124558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 December 2021 18 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 13 December 2020 15 April 2022 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 13 December 2019 15 April 2022 549 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 13 December 2018 15 April 2022 915 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 13 December 2017 15 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2017 Not Required