Financial history LANGBUURI LIMITED

Charity number: 1124558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/12/2017 13/12/2018 13/12/2019 13/12/2020 13/12/2021
Total gross income £2.55k £150 £103 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.82k £270 £138 £148 £148
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A