CLEAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to raise funds for care, education and research in order to enable children and adults suffering developmental and coordination difficulties, or with special educational needs, brain injury, spinal inujry or long-term neurological disabilities to participate in physical exercise and rehabilitation programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 July 2008: Standard registration
- RESEARCH INSTITUTE FOR MOVEMENT DISORDERS TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK MCVEIGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TERRY BURT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANDREW MEANEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN O'CONNOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.74k | £1.58k | £4.27k | £798 | £18 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04k | £660 | £4.36k | £581 | £388 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 23/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE SUFFERING MOVEMENT DISORDERS OF ANY DESCRIPTION BY PROVIDING EXERCISE AND REHABILITATION AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORT AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FROM WHICH THEY WOULD BE OTHERWISE EXCLUDED. TO ADVANCE RESEARCH IN MOVEMENT OPTIMISATION AND MOVEMENT SCIENCE IN PEOPLE WITH MOVEMENT DISORDERS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MOVEMENT DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 FERNBANK ROAD
ASCOT
SL5 8HB
- Phone:
- 01344882429
- Email:
- info@cleartrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window