Accounts and annual returns THE BREADSTICKS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 07 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 14 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 18 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 07 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 07 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window