Financial history THE BREADSTICKS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.31m £1.34m £2.31m £200.35k £927.53k
Total expenditure £1.07m £964.47k £735.89k £229.88k £119.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.31m £1.34m £2.15m N/A £812.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £8 £74 £153.65k N/A £115.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £948.59k £720.54k N/A £114.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £15.88k £0 N/A £4.84k
Expenditure - Governance £2.35k £1.87k £2.86k N/A £625
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £114.11k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £4.84k
Expenditure - Other £13.86k £0 £15.35k N/A £0