Accounts and annual returns YORKSHIRE AND HUMBER FAITHS FORUM

Charity number: 1124094
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On time
Annual return 31 March 2010 29 November 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 24 November 2010 On time