PINDERFIELDS SPINAL INJURIES CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance to The Mid Yorkshire Hospitals NHS Trust to enhance the quality of facilities available to patients with spinal injuries and assisting SPINE, a charity established to support to people with spinal cord injuries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 04 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Crossley | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEVAN BAKER | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW BURT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET PRITCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN CURSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL RAMM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADAM RICHARD NORTH PERKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.49k | £54.14k | £58.92k | £65.77k | £67.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.35k | £48.66k | £94.14k | £46.08k | £52.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO; 1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE RECEIVED SPINAL INJURIES; 2) THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACCEPTATION FOR SUCH PERSONS AFORESAID WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH CONCERNING THE TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION OF SUCH PERSONS AFORESAID; 4) THE PROMOTION OR ASSISTING IN THE PROMOTION OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF PINDERFIELD HOSPITAL AT WAKEFIELD.
Area of benefit
PINDERFIELD HOSPITAL AT WAKEFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 GEORGE STREET
WAKEFIELD
WEST YORKSHIRE
WF1 1LX
- Phone:
- 01924376045
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window