Accounts and annual returns ISLAMIC ACADEMY OF COVENTRY (IAC)
Charity number: 1124362

Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 February 2022 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 14 March 2020 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 14 April 2019 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window