Accounts and annual returns SCIENTIFIC COMMITTEE ON ANTARCTIC RESEARCH

Charity number: 1124840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window