Accounts and annual returns THE COLLEGE OF SAINT MARY OF WINCHESTER IN OXFORD, COMMONLY CALLED NEW COLLEGE

Charity number: 1142701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 14 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 August 2020 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 16 August 2020 77 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 June 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 June 2019 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 24 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window