Financial history THE COLLEGE OF SAINT MARY OF WINCHESTER IN OXFORD, COMMONLY CALLED NEW COLLEGE

Charity number: 1142701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £21.35m £16.96m £17.33m £15.99m £17.80m
Total expenditure £17.56m £17.14m £20.13m £16.61m £16.93m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £32.13m £5.33m £3.52m £3.90m £7.16m
Income - Other trading activities £146.00k £471.00k £214.00k £110.00k £9.00k
Income - Charitable activities £9.31m £9.32m £9.36m £7.98m £8.03m
Income - Endowments £23.10m £1.76m £73.00k £970.00k £1.20m
Income - Investment £2.88m £3.60m £4.31m £4.32m £3.10m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £660.00k £694.00k
Income - Legacies £1.27m £370.00k £187.00k £824.30k £281.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.27m £15.97m £18.89m £15.81m £16.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.29m £1.17m £1.24m £807.00k £758.00k
Expenditure - Governance £22.00k £19.00k £24.00k £27.00k £35.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £187.00k £1.00k £222.00k £17.43k £226.04k
Expenditure - Investment management £767.00k £626.00k £666.00k £262.00k £245.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0