Financial history THE PARK FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1124445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.05k £6.82k £4.40k £629 £357
Total expenditure £41.21k £69.85k £64.64k £103.33k £67.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A