LONDON CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST

Charity number: 1124513
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £73.84k £24.78k £17.25k £33.22k £10.72k
Total expenditure £74.21k £24.33k £19.30k £31.42k £6.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A