Accounts and annual returns HEART FOR TRUTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1129355
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 23 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 19 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required