NEWCASTLE UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.92m £2.71m £3.64m £3.80m £6.23m
Total expenditure £1.87m £2.66m £3.47m £3.51m £4.00m
Income from government contracts £193.67k £21.39k £64.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £121.71k £64.00k £239.42k £223.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £214.57k £625.79k £960.74k £734.13k £1.78m
Income - Other trading activities £161.61k £264.51k £364.63k £262.57k £203.66k
Income - Charitable activities £1.55m £1.82m £2.31m £2.80m £4.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.86k £2.23k £1.74k £5.49k £2.63k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £2.45m £3.19m £3.30m £3.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £157.65k £207.23k £282.87k £210.74k £171.53k
Expenditure - Governance £4.10k £7.80k £18.99k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0