Accounts and annual returns THYROID UK

Charity number: 1125270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 29 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window