Financial history THYROID UK

Charity number: 1125270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £73.53k £91.59k £83.40k £73.10k £76.99k
Total expenditure £67.74k £91.67k £68.39k £73.27k £75.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A